Click here for our other

The method traditionally used for multiplying two numbers of two or more digits is **long multiplication**, but this is quite an abstract process which is difficult to understand for many children. **Grid Multiplication** (also known as the **Grid Method**) is now taught in schools as an intermediate stage before long multiplication.

With**grid multiplication**, the two numbers to be multiplied are split (*partitioned*) up into their tens and units components - e.g. 34 = 30 + 4, or hundreds, tens, and units components - e.g. 345 = 300 + 40 + 5. (Click here for our 2-digit number partitioning worksheets and 3-digit number partitioning worksheets for partitioning practice)

The**grid method** enables a complex multiplication to be broken up into a collection of relatively simple multiplications followed by some column addition.

## Grid Method Example

54 x 12 can be *partitioned* to give us (50 + 4) x (10 + 2)

this can be expanded to four simple multiplications which when added together give the final answer: (50 x 10) + (50 x 2) + (10 x 4) + (4 x 2).

This is done with the use of a**grid** as shown below:

Total up the columns and write the totals in the row at the bottom of the grid. Then finally add together those totals for the final answer. Here 54 x 12 = 540 + 108 =__648__.

The Grid Method*can* be used to multiply very large numbers using a larger grid, but by the time a child is confident multiplying 3- and 4- digit numbers using grid multiplication, they are ready for long multiplication which is a faster method.

## TU x U Grid Multiplication Worksheets

Here numbers of type TU are multiplied by numbers of type U, for example **17x4**, **23x9**. The child must first partition the TU value and enter the T and U components into the grid together with the U type number by which TU is to be multiplied.

If this number partitioning and/or grid set up causes any problems, try Grid Multiplication TUxU Partitioned which are worksheets in which the TUxU values have been partitioned and pre-entered in the grid so the child can focus on the multiplications and additions aspects of the grid method.

Next move on to Grid Multiplication**TUxTU**.

With

The

this can be expanded to four simple multiplications which when added together give the final answer: (50 x 10) + (50 x 2) + (10 x 4) + (4 x 2).

This is done with the use of a

x | 10 | 2 |

50 | 500 | 100 |

4 | 40 | 8 |

total | 540 | 108 |

Total up the columns and write the totals in the row at the bottom of the grid. Then finally add together those totals for the final answer. Here 54 x 12 = 540 + 108 =

The Grid Method

If this number partitioning and/or grid set up causes any problems, try Grid Multiplication TUxU Partitioned which are worksheets in which the TUxU values have been partitioned and pre-entered in the grid so the child can focus on the multiplications and additions aspects of the grid method.

Next move on to Grid Multiplication

All worksheets published online at

for non-commercial use by schools, children, parents, and care givers.

© 2010-2018 Mental-Arithmetic.co.uk - All Rights Reserved